Accounts and annual returns WILLOWFIELD PRE-SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1142187
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 August 2024 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 15 August 2024 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 September 2023 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 18 September 2023 80 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 19 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 February 2021 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 February 2021 223 days late Download Open in new window