UNLEASHING POTENTIAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CV WORKSHOPS EMPLOYABILITY SESSIONS MENTORING COACHING DEVELOPING SKILLS AMONGST PEOPLE THROUGH ENGAGING THEM IN FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES FOR CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS IN MALAWI AND LUTON. TO HELP SUPPORT DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES. LITERACY WORKSHOPS0001
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Luton
- Malawi
Governance
- 12 January 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irfan Iqbal | Chair | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Salma Khan | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amar Azam | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.05k | £2.30k | £4.61k | £1.00k | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.71k | £1.77k | £4.71k | £900 | £116 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 179 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 179 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 545 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 545 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 23 January 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 03 December 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 22/12/2013 AS AMENDED ON 20/04/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT. 2. SUPPORTING DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN MALAWI AND LUTON BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
214 DUNSTABLE ROAD
LUTON
LU4 8JL
- Phone:
- 07956765455
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window