Financial history Swan Youth Project (Norfolk) Ltd

Charity number: 1143957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £71.54k £111.24k £156.85k £267.32k £324.77k
Total expenditure £49.44k £72.04k £130.85k £194.80k £267.03k
Income from government contracts £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £20.00k N/A £30.00k £73.20k