GENESIS EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Genesis Educational Charity is a new charity. The trustees have spent the first year consolidating the governance of the charity and will be looking to make charitable distributions in the next financial year. They will also be looking into funding sources when planning future activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 June 2011: Standard registration
- 09 November 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2012 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2012 | 24 April 2013 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/06/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY (IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY): 4.1 PROVIDING AND MANAGING EDUCATIONAL BUILDINGS AND FACILITIES FOR COLLEGES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND THEIR RESPECTIVE STUDENTS; AND 4.2 PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES, SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window