Financial history ORACH CHAIM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1142504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £14.32k £8.93k £482.19k £262.98k £41.32k
Total expenditure £14.98k £4.69k £189.53k £520.47k £75.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A