AFGHAN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty and hardship particularly, but not exclusively amongst those of Afghan descent in such ways as the trustees shall think fit, including providing advice and information, educational and training courses. To advance the education of the public in all aspects of Afghan history and culture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 16 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 14 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ayazullah Safi | Chair | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Navid Khan | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Ibrahim | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Asad Rahim | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 16/03/2020 | 16/03/2021 | 16/03/2022 | 16/03/2023 | 16/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 March 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Constitution
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND HARDSHIP PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST THOSE OF AFGHAN DESCENT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, INCLUDING PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION, EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING COURSES. 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF AFGHAN HISTORY AND CULTURE
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Scholars Gate
BIRMINGHAM
B33 0DL
- Phone:
- 07462234639
- Email:
- ayaz.safi@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window