Accounts and annual returns PINHOE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1142976
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 24 March 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2014 24 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 08 April 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2013 14 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 14 January 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2012 11 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 14 January 2013 On Time