Financial history AFM KINGDOM WORSHIP CENTRE

Charity number: 1144645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £65.83k £69.53k £73.21k £49.02k £54.79k
Total expenditure £66.24k £42.84k £50.62k £64.23k £62.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.03k N/A N/A N/A