Financial history ARMED FORCES PARA-SNOWSPORT TEAM

Charity number: 1142135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £495.63k £304.02k £179.75k £234.66k £270.41k
Total expenditure £352.45k £120.58k £255.12k £205.72k £263.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £212.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A