ARMED FORCES PARA-SNOWSPORT TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Armed Forces Para-Snowsport Team (AFPST) (formerly the Combined Services Disabled Ski Team (CSDST)) is a charitable organisation which helps to rehabilitate those serving and retired service personnel who are Wounded, Injured or Sick (WIS), though not necessarily due to their military service, through participation in the sport of Alpine Skiing. It is run entirely by volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 May 2011: Standard registration
- AFPST (Working name)
- CSDST (Working name)
- COMBINED SERVICES DISABLED SKI TEAM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAJOR GENERAL MARK PULLAN | Chair | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
David John Tozer | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Mackenzie Hay | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Andrew Stuart Garner | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Spanner | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Spencer Howard Bull | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jill Denise Ahrens | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Liz Winfield | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Brigadier Andrew David Cox MBE | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK EARNEST HARGREAVES OBE | Trustee | 07 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £495.63k | £304.02k | £179.75k | £234.66k | £270.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £352.45k | £120.58k | £255.12k | £205.72k | £263.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £212.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/01/2016 as amended on 24 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN THROUGH THE ENCOURAGEMENT, SUPPORT AND PROVISION OF ADAPTIVE WINTER SPORTS ACTIVITES FOR INJURED OR DISABLED SERVICE PERSONNEL. 2. THE RELIEF IN NEED, AND PROMOTION OF HEALTHY RECREATION, OF INJURED OR DISABLED FORMER SERVICE PERSONNEL THROUGH THE ENCOURAGEMENT, SUPPORT AND PROVISION OF ADAPTIVE WINTER SPORTS ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Blossom Yard
Fourth Floor
London
E1 6RS
- Phone:
- 07508015053
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window