Financial history RUBICON CARES

Charity number: 1144081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £182.17k £264.84k £203.78k £194.16k £106.74k
Total expenditure £160.15k £188.84k £204.03k £218.97k £162.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £50.00k £4.83k £101.15k £56.18k N/A