RUBICON CARES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer free 1:1 specialist trauma counselling to people affected by any crime in Kent and Medway. Our main office is in Maidstone. We have satellite offices in Medway, Ashford, Tonbridge. We run a Helpline for people who are unable to access our offices. Professionals may also use this Helpline if they wish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 30 September 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA EASTON | Chair | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Monika Wilde | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Freya Rich | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Patrick O'Neill | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tad Taberer | Trustee | 09 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EDWARD ATKINSON | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.17k | £264.84k | £203.78k | £194.16k | £106.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.15k | £188.84k | £204.03k | £218.97k | £162.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.00k | £4.83k | £101.15k | £56.18k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 22/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN KENT SUFFERING FROM TRAUMA AS A RESULT OF BEING VICTIMS OF SERIOUS CRIME, BY THE PROVISION OF LOW COST OR FREE COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF A SPECIALIST HELPLINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maidstone Community Support Centre
39-48 Marsham Street
MAIDSTONE
ME14 1HH
- Phone:
- 01622230736
- Email:
- contact@rubiconcares.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window