The Police Children's Charity

Charity number: 1147445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE RELIEF OF THOSE IS NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO SUPPORT CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 WHERE A PARENT WHO IS, OR WAS, A SERVING OFFICER, HAS DIED OR HAS BECOME INCAPACITATED IN SOME WAY THAT AFFECTS EARNING CAPABILITY.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 February 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SGPT (Working name)
  • St George's Police Children Trust (Working name)
  • ST GEORGE'S POLICE CHILDRENTRUST (Previous name)
  • ST GEORGE'S POLICE TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Liam Kelly Chair 13 June 2018
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Stuart Cowan Trustee 01 April 2025
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Stuart Burns Houston Trustee 01 February 2025
None on record
Dr Sarah Raitt Trustee 01 February 2025
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Janet Ramakrishnan Fisher Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Nicholas James Smart Trustee 24 July 2024
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Elaine McCormill Trustee 02 July 2024
None on record
Tim Forber Trustee 18 June 2024
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Matthew Hamilton Trustee 19 February 2024
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Lauren Poultney Trustee 18 January 2024
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Christopher Henry Bentley Trustee 28 June 2023
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Robin William Fraser Hay Trustee 18 October 2022
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Allen James Shaw Trustee 12 July 2022
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Kate Louise Meynell Trustee 25 April 2022
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Ciaron David Irvine Trustee 25 January 2022
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Richie Murray Trustee 01 January 2022
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Brian Norman Mills Jones Trustee 16 February 2021
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Richard Brian Wood Trustee 08 April 2020
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
Trevor Purcell Trustee 16 July 2018
None on record
MARK DAVIS Trustee 11 May 2017
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
ALAN LEES Trustee 02 August 2016
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
John Patrick Robins Trustee 16 June 2016
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time
John Skelton Trustee 12 May 2016
THE POLICE TREATMENT CENTRES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.17m £1.22m £1.22m £1.24m £1.25m
Total expenditure £1.18m £1.32m £813.22k £870.54k £1.38m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £527.80k £557.23k £531.05k £520.85k £491.36k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £641.39k £664.86k £684.70k £721.44k £762.65k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.25m £738.16k £794.45k £1.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £78.48k £68.44k £75.06k £76.09k £70.19k
Expenditure - Governance £156.11k £147.32k £152.59k £6.02k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £78.48k £0 £75.06k £76.09k £70.19k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £391.84k £382.94k £374.03k £365.13k £356.22k
Long-term investments £16.72m £17.52m £18.72m £16.97m £17.39m
Other assets £669.09k £553.95k £723.53k £673.53k £626.57k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £3.81m £4.13m £3.99m £3.71m £3.96m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 22 APRIL 1960 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 20 AUGUST 1981, 23 NOVEMBER 1994 & 3 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN OR TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE EDUCATION, SUPPORT, BENEFIT AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND ONE OR BOTH OF WHOSE PARENTS, EITHER HAVING BEEN, OR BEING TREATED AS IF THEY WERE OFFICERS OF ANY RANK IN ONE OF THE POLICE FORCES NAMED IN THE SECOND SCHEDULE TO THE 1981 SCHEME, ARE DEAD OR INCAPACITATED FROM EARNING A LIVING, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE COMMITTEE IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 14 February 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Northern Police Convalescent Home
St. Andrews
Harlow Moor Road
Harrogate
HG2 0AD
Phone:
01423504448
Website:

No information available