BRISTOL FASHION BARBERSHOP CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bristol Fashion Chorus is an award winning ladies' chorus which strives for musical excellence in 4 part A-Capella singing. We sing primarily in the barbershop style and aim to encourage and develop the style through our chorus, quartets and small group performances. Our mission is to educate, support and enrich the lives of our diverse membership and share the gift of music with our audiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
Governance
- 10 February 2012: Standard registration
- BRISTOL FASHION (Working name)
- BRISTOL FASHION LADIES' BARBERSHOP CLUB (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Felicity Proctor | Chair | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Nickson | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Penfold | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Nichol | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor Shenton | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kath Anderson | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Celia Nickson | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANIS SMITH | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG WILLIAM KEHOE | Trustee | 18 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.22k | £9.38k | £10.01k | £11.17k | £10.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.86k | £6.70k | £8.84k | £6.70k | £12.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19/01/2012 as amended on 27 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF SINGING IN THE BARBERSHOP STYLE OF UNACCOMPANIED FOUR-PART CLOSE HARMONY IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Blackthorn Square
CLEVEDON
North Somerset
BS21 5EF
- Phone:
- 07799365678
- Email:
- info@bristol-fashion.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window