Governing document ASPIRED FUTURES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/07/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/12/2015
Charitable objects
1 - TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF VULNERABLE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM HARD TO REACH FAMILIES THROUGH A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL, EDUCATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPABILITIES, CAPACITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2 - THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH WITHIN HARD TO REACH FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF HEALTH, RESPITE, ADVICE, PARENTING SKILLS AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.