PETERBOROUGH EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1143019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF LEARNERS AT PETERBOROUGH REGIONAL COLLEGE BY AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, GRANTS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES; 2 TO PROVIDE RESOURCES TO SUPPORT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF LEARNERS AT PETERBOROUGH REGIONAL COLLEGE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £51
Total expenditure: £9,390

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Peterborough City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 July 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laila Bentley Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
LOUISE AILSA PERRY Trustee 03 July 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £3.69k £104 £8 £204 £51
Total expenditure £7.56k £3.87k £0 £6.96k £9.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 13 September 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 13 July 2023 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 June 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 July 2020 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PETERBOROUGH COLLEGE
PARK CRESCENT
PETERBOROUGH
PE1 4DZ
Phone:
01733762161
Website:

No information available