EASTBOURNE BIRD AID CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support learning disabled and autistic adults who for what ever reason do not get an adult social care service. In our retail, hospitality and Gull rehabilitation centre activities. This reduces isolation, develops new skills, improves communication and interaction with community. Whilst promoting a positive image of Gulls, and other Seabirds and helping to conserve a red listed bird
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 09 September 2011: Standard registration
- BIRD AID (Previous name)
- EASTBOURNE BIRD AID LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Jane Grice | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jetta Elliott | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Christine Welham-Jones | Trustee | 18 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIA GOULD | Trustee | 09 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
DARREN JOHN GRICE | Trustee | 09 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.40k | £98.65k | £309.34k | £100.75k | £90.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.49k | £70.44k | £123.89k | £70.48k | £77.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.46k | £11.07k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 February 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 February 2022 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 14 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF CARE, EDUCATION AND WORK EXPERIENCE IN A SAFE AND SECURE ENVIRONMENT. 2) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS WILD BIRDS AND ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR WILD BIRDS AND ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO BIRD AND ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG WILDLIFE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bird Aid
Unit 11-12
The Quintins
North Street
HAILSHAM
East Sus
- Phone:
- 01323841755
- Email:
- CONTACT@BIRDAID.CO.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window