Financial history THE BROCKLEY JACK THEATRE LTD

Charity number: 1143158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £119.47k £83.31k £130.09k £100.61k £104.21k
Total expenditure £118.07k £76.13k £99.32k £125.42k £104.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.95k £95.97k N/A N/A