GEOMON-ANGLESEY GEOPARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trustees attended various international geopark meetings.Held guided field walks,trips & talks for members, public & external groups, visiting key geological sites.Volunteers manned exhibition centre at Watch House, Amlwch Port, in summer months, with over 5,000 visitors. Grant award from Anglesey Council SDF fund to install new bi-lingual audio system to guide visitors through the exhibition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,876 from 3876 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 15 December 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Colin Jago | Chair | 09 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Maia Whomsley-Walker | Trustee | 13 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dei Huws | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Crossley | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin J Schwaller | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Stephen Conway | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline May Schwaller | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Rowlands | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Cynthia Veronica Burek | Trustee | 02 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr MARGARET WOOD | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.83k | £8.62k | £13.67k | £7.19k | £23.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.05k | £6.74k | £10.68k | £11.11k | £12.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.81k | N/A | £5.30k | N/A | £3.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 July 2022 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 05 August 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/08/2011 as amended on 16 May 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION,PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF ANGLESEY'S OUTSTANDING GEODIVERSITY RESOURCES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND TO USE THE GEODIVESRITY RESOURCES, FOR EDUCATION AND GEOTOURISM, FOR THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC BENEFIT OF ANGLESEY'S INHABITANTS AND THOSE OF NEIGHBOURING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coleg
Llansadwrn
Menai Bridge
LL59 5SN
- Phone:
- 01248810287
- Email:
- college@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window