THE STANLEY ATKINSON FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PAY IN WHOLE OR IN PART THE BALANCE OF THE ANNUAL TELEPHONE RENTAL REMAINING DUE FROM THOSE ELDERLY PERSONS IN NECISSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WHO BENEFIT UNDER THE CORPORATION'S ASSISTED TELEPHONE SCHEME OR TO PAY IN WHOLE OR IN PART THE TELEPHONE INSTALLATION CHARGES AND ANNUAL RENTAL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE ELDERLY PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Other Finance
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 09 November 1972: Standard registration
- 30 March 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84 | £114 | £127 | £65 | £67 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £15.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 15 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 13 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 20 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 18 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1972.
Charitable objects
TO PAY IN WHOLE OR IN PART THE BALANCE OF THE ANNUAL TELEPHONE RENTAL REMAINING DUE FROM THOSE ELDERLY PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WHO BENEFIT UNDER THE CORPORATION'S ASSISTED TELEPHONE SCHEME OR TO PAY IN WHOE OR IN PART THE TELEPHONE INSTALLATION CHARGES AND ANNUAL TELEPHONE RENTAL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE ELDERLY PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON HULL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window