Financial history AL-MAHDI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1146363
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £41.92k £29.37k £38.78k £49.18k £39.33k
Total expenditure £29.77k £14.56k £20.21k £31.77k £25.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A