Accounts and annual returns LLANYNYS COMMUNITY PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1148611
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 February 2025 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 December 2024 316 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 February 2025 371 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required