THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS MILTON IN THE DIOCESE OF ELY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC maintains an overview of worship throughout the parish and puts forward suggestions on how our services can involve the many groups that make up the community of Milton. Our services and worship put faith into practice through prayer and scripture, music and sacrament.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
73 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 13 June 2011: Standard registration
- PCC OF ALL SAINTS, MILTON, CAMBRIDGE (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alexander Jeewan | Chair | 26 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Amanda Jane Scarborough | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosanna Bienzobas | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Howard Edward Scarborough | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Cottingham | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anne Louise Aldridge | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Marion English | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALAN HARRY SKULL | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pearl Ruth Skull | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Owen | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Sidney Charles Metcalfe | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gordon Wilkins | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Desiree Cottingham | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maria Gloag | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Henderson | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Neil Caplan | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew MacPherson | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev SIMON BRADFORD | Trustee | 27 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
BILL DARROCH | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roxane Owen | Trustee | 13 June 2011 |
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN HASTINGS | Trustee | 13 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN BURROWS | Trustee | 06 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.16k | £151.28k | £161.45k | £139.73k | £150.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.72k | £138.59k | £159.88k | £138.99k | £135.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church
Church Lane
Milton
Cambridge
CB24 6AB
- Phone:
- 01223 441007
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window