TRUE JESUS CHURCH (LEICESTER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church is to preach the salvation grace of Christ Jesus, the one true God. The benefit is for those who believe to gain eternal life in future. The church provides a place of worship for the members and truth seeking friends in Leicestershire and surrounding conties. The church also hold regular services on Saturday, for the members to keep the Sabbath.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicester City
Governance
- 25 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chi Wai Liu | Chair | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Ming Mun Shek | Trustee | 04 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wing Fung Chan | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ying Har Chan | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Pak Hei Shek | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MING KEAT HO BA | Trustee | 13 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUI LAN HO | Trustee | 25 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
YUK KONG TANG | Trustee | 25 July 2011 |
|
|||||
EDMUND KWOK | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.00k | £151.30k | £183.62k | £152.04k | £212.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.00k | £71.11k | £90.75k | £115.05k | £458.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 07 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26/06/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING DOCTRINES: ONE TRUE GOD, ONE TRUE CHURCH, WATER BAPTISM, RECEIVING THE HOLY SPIRIT, FOOT WASHING, HOLY COMMUNION AND THE SABBATH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 GRANVILLE ROAD
LEICESTER
LE1 7RU
- Phone:
- 01163190205
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window