FLORENCE NGWENYA MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is still working on strategy design and programs for future activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 May 2019
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
- Nottingham City
- Angola
- Botswana
- Lesotho
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- South Africa
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 15 September 2011: Standard registration
- FNM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROMISE MPOFU | Chair | 02 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MPOFU | Trustee | 16 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
KUNDAYI MUJURU | Trustee | 15 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
STANFORD MPOFU | Trustee | 15 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/05/2015 | 24/05/2016 | 24/05/2017 | 24/05/2018 | 24/05/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days | |
Annual return | 24 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 409 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 409 days | |
Annual return | 24 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 775 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 775 days | |
Annual return | 24 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1140 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1140 days | |
Annual return | 24 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1505 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1505 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 AUG 2011
Charitable objects
1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN MATABELELAND BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY 2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG WOMEN RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN MATABELELAND 3) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF GIRLS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN MATABELELAND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: (A) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; (B) PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 4) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY [FOR EXAMPLE]: (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY , SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (D) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; (E) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. 5) TO PROMOTE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF MATABELELAND AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, AND TO PROVIDE RELIEF FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ITS RESIDENTS OF ALL AGES; AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE AFOREMENTIONED RESIDENTS TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN THE LIFE OF THEIR COMMUNITY IN WAYS WHICH ADDRESS AND ALLEVIATE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
117 Woodstock Road
Moston
Manchester
M40 0DG
- Phone:
- 01619008941
- Email:
- PROELAND2306@YAHOO.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window