THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DULVERTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Provisional of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved Teaching of Christianity through sermons,courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and meetings and distribution of literature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 19 July 2011: Standard registration
- All Saints Church Dulverton (Working name)
- All Saints Church Dulverton (Working name)
- ALL SAINTS PCC, DULVERTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Nicoll | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Harrison | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dowell Conning | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|||||
William Gash | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Barker | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edward Thomson | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Vanstone | Trustee | 25 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDY JEFFRIES | Trustee | 19 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Steve Ford | Trustee | 27 April 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.28k | £48.10k | £59.18k | £55.38k | £72.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.23k | £82.12k | £79.36k | £77.85k | £100.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 December 2020 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 December 2020 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church
Bank Square
DULVERTON
Somerset
TA22 9BU
- Phone:
- 01398323028
- Website:
-
dulvertonbenefice.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window