PERSHORE MIDSUMMER BRASS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the art of brass band music, particularly, but not exclusively, though the organising and staging of a brass band music festival in Pershore.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 07 December 2011: Standard registration
- PMB (Working name)
- PERSHORE MIDSUMMER BRASS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher John License | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Robert Richardson | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN PETERS | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20k | £1 | £7.75k | £12.13k | £12.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.66k | £10 | £7.77k | £12.71k | £14.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 30 NOV 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ART OF BRASS BAND MUSIC, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH ORGANISING AND STAGING OF A BRASS BAND MUSIC FESTIVAL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE TOWN OF PERSHORE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Harrington Road
WORCESTER
WR2 5HB
- Phone:
- 07990558552
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window