Financial history THE MIDCOUNTIES CO-OPERATIVE COMMUNITY FUND

Charity Number: 1143181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £237.53k £26.04k £178.80k £153.05k £109.57k
Total expenditure £242.29k £134.63k £203.97k £166.50k £116.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A