Trustees UNIVERSITY OF CENTRAL LANCASHIRE STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1142616

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Additi Nema | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Ashlie Duncan | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Rose Wilson | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Wai Yip LO | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Manya Raj | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Beckett | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Bigland | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Fitzgerald | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Lastoweckyi | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Barratt | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Katherine Sims | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.