THE ABBEYFIELD (RIPON AND DISTRICT) SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 501960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supported sheltered housing for elderly

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £128,661
Total expenditure: £172,639

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 January 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Anne Nichols Chair 20 July 2022
None on record
James Alexander Ward Trustee 10 November 2024
None on record
Paul Derek Stephens Trustee 29 November 2023
None on record
Alexander Taylor Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Janet Allon-Smith Trustee 23 November 2022
None on record
Janice Marie Sherwood Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Janette Mary Newman Trustee 19 February 2020
None on record
Kathryn Ann Bailey Mrs Trustee 13 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £116.45k £103.55k £113.28k £121.14k £128.66k
Total expenditure £118.21k £119.97k £146.80k £140.60k £172.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 27 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 31 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 27 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 18 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 18 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ABBEYFIELD HOUSE
CHURCH LANE
RIPON
NORTH YORKSHIRE
HG4 2ES
Phone:
01765605446