Trustees Uncurbed Collective

Charity number: 1143958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Aaron Sean Conneran Trustee 28 April 2025
None on record
Jennifer Baidoo Trustee 28 October 2024
None on record
Dr Simon Philip Ruding Trustee 23 May 2024
QUILTS FOR CARE LEAVERS (Q4CL)
Recently registered
Tamsin Drury Trustee 16 January 2024
None on record
KELLY HOYE Trustee 20 July 2011
None on record
JANET CHARLESWORTH Trustee 20 July 2011
None on record