Financial history WORLD WIDE MISSIONARY MOVEMENT OF UK

Charity number: 1142669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £91.26k £82.70k £75.78k £78.62k £95.87k
Total expenditure £114.57k £85.57k £72.86k £77.19k £93.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A