THE OAKS PLAYSCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a holiday playscheme during the Easter and Summer Holidays for children with disabilities and additional needs aged 3 to 11 years and to provide respite for their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
Total income includes £11,396 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 31 August 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Kalahar | Chair | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Elizabeth Hiscutt | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHARON JOHNSON | Trustee | 06 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.05k | £24.05k | £14.34k | £15.03k | £15.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.87k | £15.88k | £14.62k | £18.37k | £18.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.72k | £14.29k | £12.56k | £11.40k | £11.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 18/08/2011
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THEIR PARENTS AND CARERS BY OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY AND CARE FACILITIES FOR SUCH CHILDREN IN A SAFE AND SECURE ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROTHERCOMBE FARM
PETERSFIELD
GU32 3PQ
- Phone:
- 01730261866
- Email:
- oaksplayscheme@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
oaksplayscheme.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window