ISLAMIC EDUCATION CULTURAL CENTRE & QURAN ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prime objective is to promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of community of Birmingham in advancement of the Islamic religion, promote education, relieve poverty and sickness by associating together with representatives of the community, statutory authorities and other organisations in area of benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Solihull
Governance
- 20 October 2011: Standard registration
- QAT (Working name)
- QURAN ACADEMY TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TOUSEF AZHAR | Chair | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMJAD HUSSAIN | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD SAQIB IMITIAZ | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAVED IQBAL | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
RAFIAH AZHAR | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.59k | £28.37k | £43.94k | £25.39k | £23.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.29k | £29.53k | £37.62k | £23.39k | £22.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2023 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2023 | 217 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2022 | 249 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2022 | 250 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 25/09/2011
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUNDS AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM (HEREIN AFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR), TO ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION, PROMOTE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER WITH REPRESENTATIVES OF THE COMMUNITY, STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Quran Academy Mosque
140 Mansel Road
BIRMINGHAM
B10 9NJ
- Phone:
- 01217739604
- Email:
- quranacademyuk@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window