Trustees SIMPLY CYCLING
Charity number: 1143362

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIZ CLARKE | Chair | 08 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
David Bradford | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linda Hogan | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Whitelegge | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amy Blakemore | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Elizabeth Painter | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Wood | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.