WYTHENSHAWE AMATEURS FC
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Throughout the 2013 season the club ran two senior men's teams in the Manchester leagues and a ladies team in the Cheshire league. It also has a thriving junior section with 20 teams of all ages. Full details and league reports may be found on our website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 May 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Manchester City
Governance
- 01 September 2011: Standard registration
- 01 December 2016: Removed (Exempt charity)
- WYTHENSHAWE AFC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2012 | 30/05/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.24k | £48.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.82k | £45.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 May 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 May 2013 | 02 July 2014 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2013 | 02 July 2014 | 94 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/06/2011
Charitable objects
2.1 THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CLUB IS ESTABLISHED ARE: 2.1.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS ('FACILITIES' MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANIZING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 2.1.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 2.1.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window