JEWISH LEGACY GIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the importance of legacy giving throughout the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 October 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Overlander-Kaye | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Diamond | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Broza | Trustee | 30 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Peter Evans | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Greenberg | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL ROSS | Trustee | 13 June 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.83k | £65.67k | £62.49k | £52.29k | £48.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.07k | £59.51k | £55.17k | £83.31k | £41.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 January 2024 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 November 2020 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/09/2011
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING FUNDRAISING AND LEGACY GIVING PARTICULARLY FROM (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) WITHIN THE UK JEWISH COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Green Lane
Croxley Green
Rickmansworth
WD3 3HR
- Phone:
- 07538812380
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window