THE ETON FIVES ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To promote community participation in the sport of Eton Fives and such other amateur sports as the Trustees shall determine by providing or assisting in the provision of facilities for the playing of Eton Fives and 2. to advance physical education of young persons by assisting in the facilities for the playing and learning of Eton Fives in schools and universities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 March 2013: Standard registration
- THE ETON FIVES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew James Beard | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Kwee Scoones | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Bebb Williams | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Charlotta Ena Marie-Christine Cooley | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Barnes | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Paul Wear Bishop | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Katherine Lloyd Wood | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Carron Lumbard | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Andrew Woolfries | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Chinery | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sunil Tailor | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Patrick Powell | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Howard Mark Edward Wiseman | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.35k | £138.93k | £200.76k | £176.49k | £131.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.80k | £137.70k | £202.14k | £172.12k | £126.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 March 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 01 March 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/03/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/11/2012 as amended on 11 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORT OF ETON FIVES AND SUCH OTHER AMATEUR SPORTS AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL DETERMINE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ETON FIVES (FACILITIES MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES) (B) TO ADVANCE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING AND LEARNING OF ETON FIVES IN SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Sandhills Crescent
SOLIHULL
West Midlands
B91 3UE
- Phone:
- 0142022107
- Email:
- mppowell52@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window