Financial history THE PUBLIC ARTS TRUST, MILTON KEYNES LIMITED

Charity number: 1143843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5 £0 £3.71k £0 £0
Total expenditure £192 £143 £6.57k £142 £142
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A