THE PUBLIC ARTS TRUST, MILTON KEYNES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exhibition of sculptures by artists in the Central Milton Keynes shopping centre known as thecentre:mk. This was directed at gaining attention to sculpture & PAT-MK. This concentrated on artists with existing sculptures in Milton Keynes. We rescued two sculptures, by the renowned sculptor Keith McCarter, for display in Milton Keynes. Ongoing discussions with stakeholders to conserve sculptures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 19 September 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Stabler | Chair | 19 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Elizabeth Calverley | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JOHN SKELTON | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|||||
IAN BRUCE MICHIE | Trustee | 19 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5 | £0 | £3.71k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £192 | £143 | £6.57k | £142 | £142 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/08/2011
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF EDUCATION, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS IN MILTON KEYNES (THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") AND SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF EXISTING PUBLIC ART AND THE COMMISSIONING OF NEW PUBLIC ART WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 TOWER DRIVE
NEATH HILL
MILTON KEYNES
MK14 6JX
- Phone:
- 01908672599
- Email:
- DSTABLER@TOUCANSURF.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window