ST JAMES AND NEW CROSS GATEWAY TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a member of New Cross and Deptford Families First (Co no. 07645531),a not for profit service company,delivering services to support the charities aims primarily: the relief of families in the UK who are underprivileged or disadvantaged and/or in need in some manner or form, with the object of improving their conditions of life for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 19 September 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM EDWARDS CBE MA | Chair | 22 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
JULIE LOUISE RUSH B.ED PRI. | Trustee | 19 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.51k | £1.15k | £1.41k | £0 | £1.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 June 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 08 April 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Memorandum
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYÔÇÖS OBJECTS (ÔÇ£OBJECTSÔÇØ) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEWISHAM AND SOUTHWARK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG PERSONS AND THEIR PARENTS AND CARERS BY THE PROVISION OF A FAMILY CENTRE PROVIDING TRAINING, ADVICE , INFORMATION AND SUPPORT FOR FAMILIES AND SUCH OTHER FACILITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE. 2)TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER SUCH LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE SUCH NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11-15 St James
ST JAMES
NEW CROSS
London
SE14 6AD
- Phone:
- 02086942571
- Email:
- info@ncdfamiliesfirst.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window