Accounts and annual returns THE CITY OF CHESTER MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 501974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window