Financial history THE CITY OF CHESTER MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 501974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £41.09k £15.06k £15.61k £50.90k £20.30k
Total expenditure £41.38k £13.09k £13.82k £49.87k £16.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A