Trustees THE CITY OF CHESTER MALE VOICE CHOIR
Charity number: 501974

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ronald Webster | Chair | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Greenwood | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Taylor | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aled Jones | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Belton | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher George Oleshko | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Blair Wilson | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Cain | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Marks | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Horne | Trustee | 29 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.