MICHAEL CAUSER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Partnership with Social Landlords and LGBT housing specialists to share expertise and raise awareness of housing inequalities affecting LGBT youth. Promoting examples of good practice in LGBT inclusion through social media. Research needs of LGBT population in north-west England. Fundraising and strategic planning to develop support for young LGBT people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Halton
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 29 July 2011: Standard registration
- MCF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Macfarlane | Chair | 30 November 2016 |
|
|||||
David Parr Mr | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|||||
John Lowe | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.27k | £3.24k | £5.55k | £4.14k | £124 | |
|
Total expenditure | £962 | £11.83k | £5.78k | £19.47k | £43 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 January 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 January 2021 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/12/2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION IN RELATION TO LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER (LGBT) PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY: (A) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO ALL ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION IN RELATION TO LGBT PEOPLE, INCLUDING RAISING AWARENESS OF THE EXTENT AND IMPACT OF HATE CRIME RELATING TO LGBT PEOPLE; (B) RELIEVING THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS LIVING IN, WORKING IN, OR VISITING THE MERSEYSIDE AREA WHO ARE AFFECTED BY HOMOPHOBIC AND TRANSPHOBIC HATE CRIME BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF EMERGENCY ACCOMMODATION FOR VULNERABLE LGBT PEOPLE, AND SUPPORT FOR THE VICTIMS OF LGBT HATE CRIME AND THEIR FAMILIES; (C) ASSOCIATING WITH VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, GOVERNMENTAL, PUBLIC AND PRIVATE BODIES TO DEVELOP AND MAXIMISE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS RUN BY AND FOR LGBT PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o One Knowsley, The Courtyard
Court Hey Park
Liverpool
L16 3NA
- Phone:
- 01514891222
- Email:
- info@michaelcauser.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window