THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEDGE END ST LUKE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St. Luke's PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the Vicar in promoting, in the ecclesiastical parish, the mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. The PCC operates through a number of sub-committees which meet in-between PCC meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 20 July 2011: Standard registration
- ST LUKES HEDGE END PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nibu Thomas | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Spink | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Samuel Cuthbert | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Duffin | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Mathew | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Meriel Adams | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Rachel Blamey | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Duncan Holcombe | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Clive Philip Beard | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Compton | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alastair James Dobson | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Crutchley | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Benjamin Jones | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JONATHAN PHILLIPS | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.70k | £82.94k | £82.47k | £144.35k | £118.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.70k | £69.79k | £67.14k | £81.91k | £112.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Excepted
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Lukes Church
St. Lukes Close
Hedge End
SOUTHAMPTON
SO30 2US
- Phone:
- 01489 781448
- Email:
- office@stlukeshedgeend.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window