WANTOK SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have donated to MAF-PNG to assist with Covid relief during the pandemic. We have also provided a 5000 litre water tank to the Good Shepherd Seminary at Fatima WHP, as well as funding twelve sewing machines to the wives of graduating clergymen at Newton College, Popondetta. Donation for a patient information video at Ipswich hospital UK and also funding for hearing aids at Mt Sion, Goroka.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kiribati
- Papua New Guinea
- Solomon Islands
- Tuvalu
- Vanuatu
Governance
- 07 December 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Howard Wilken | Chair | 28 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gaiwe Lydia Turland | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melinda Alison Manuel | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Julius | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Eric Lyon Rushworth | Trustee | 28 May 2016 |
|
|||||
PATRICK KANGI | Trustee | 18 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Grace | Trustee | 18 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MILLER | Trustee | 28 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANITA WALKINSHAW | Trustee | 28 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.01k | £2.97k | £1.54k | £3.17k | £1.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.16k | £2.56k | £405 | £3.78k | £1.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MAY 2011 AS AMENDED ON 05/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN PAPUA NEW GUINEA AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEMBERS OF THE PAPUA NEW GUINEA COMMUNITY IN THE UK BY 1) THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH. 2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. 3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 4) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID. 5) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND SPORT OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 6) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Gap Road
Hunmanby Gap
FILEY
North Yorkshire
YO14 9QP
- Phone:
- 01723891818
- Email:
- davidwilken93@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window