AUGUSTINIANS OF THE ASSUMPTION

Charity number: 1143432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the Charity are the advancement of the public benefit anywhere in the world of the religious and other charitable work of the Congregation of Roman Catholic Priests and Brothers known as the Augustinians of the Assumption as the Trustees with the approval of the Superior General of the Congregation shall from time to time think fit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney
  • Hertfordshire
  • Nottinghamshire
  • Tower Hamlets
  • Waltham Forest
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • France
  • Italy
  • Kenya
  • Tanzania
  • United States
  • Vietnam

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 August 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev RICHARD ANDREW JOSEPH O'BRIEN Chair 07 July 2011
None on record
Alex Castro Trustee 15 September 2023
None on record
Pierre Cao Ba Vinh Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Br Quoc Cuong Tran Trustee 19 March 2021
None on record
Fr Viktors Jermakovics Trustee 26 March 2019
None on record
Fr Erik Samson Trustee 23 November 2017
None on record
Fr Justin Kasereka Trustee 01 December 2016
None on record
Rev DIDIER REMIOT Trustee 25 February 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £54.57k £215.55k £357.99k £4.73m £585.50k
Total expenditure £311.82k £353.93k £512.58k £342.86k £423.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £4.26m £238.19k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £465.89k £336.22k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £10.48k £11.09k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £233.51k £323.51k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £109.35k £99.71k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £20.71k £26.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £109.35k £99.71k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A £3.30m £3.26m
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A £20.89m £21.65m
Other assets N/A N/A N/A £51.70k £91.94k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A £81.46k £94.82k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 06 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Azets Holdings Ltd
River House
1 Maidstone Road
SIDCUP
Kent
DA14 5RH
Phone:
02089801968