Financial history SUNDAY FOR SAMMY TRUST

Charity Number: 1144531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £536.59k £30.46k £30.46k £0 £5.96k
Total expenditure £403.64k £47.77k £6.98k £13.15k £11.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £22.04k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £514.56k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £2 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £43.29k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £359.38k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £960 N/A N/A N/A N/A