SUNDAY FOR SAMMY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sunday for Sammy Trust raises funds via concerts and DVD sales which it distributes as grants to performers at the outset of their career who need financial assistance for training, fees, equipment etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 04 November 2011: Standard registration
- SUNDAY FOR SAMMY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAMANTHA MIA WONFOR TELFER | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
CALLUM DOUGLAS CARNEY HALBERT | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
KELLY RICKARD | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RICHARD IRWIN | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND WALTER STUBBS | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM TIMOTHY HEALY | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
LYNN O'SULLIVAN | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £536.59k | £30.46k | £30.46k | £0 | £5.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £403.64k | £47.77k | £6.98k | £13.15k | £11.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £22.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £514.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £43.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £359.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £960 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 20 April 2023 | 416 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 01/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH ENCOURAGING THEM TO TAKE PART IN THE PERFORMING ARTS TO INCREASE THEIR SELF ESTEEM AND DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS AND ABILITIES. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS THE CHARITY WILL: A) AWARD GRANTS TO HELP FINANCE COLLEGE FEES, EQUIPMENT, LIVING OR TRANSPORT COSTS ETC WHILE THEY ARE IN THE FORMATIVE STAGES OF THEIR CAREER. B) SUPPORT PERFORMANCES, PROJECTS AND EVENTS THAT WILL IMPROVE THEIR CAPABILITIES AND SHOWCASE THEIR TALENTS TO THE ENTERTAINMENT INDUSTRY AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harrison Hutchinson Ltd
246 Park View
WHITLEY BAY
Tyne And Wear
NE26 3QX
- Phone:
- 07710596749
- Email:
- info@sundayforsammy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window